This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 09:58:28 (UTC).

MARTIN MATAMOROS VS ORBITZ, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 MARTIN MATAMOROS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORBITZ, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2171

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATAMOROS MARTIN

Defendant

ORBITZ LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

10/21/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/21/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Untimely

12/22/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Untimely

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1/7/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/28/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

12/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

2/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING

2/7/2022: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) LIDYA KOLEVA

2/7/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) LIDYA KOLEVA

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/9/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/30/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/30/2022

3/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/30/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/30/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Martin Matamoros on 10/21/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING: Filed By: Martin Matamoros (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/09/2022; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Martin Matamoros (Plaintiff); Orbitz, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/30/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) NO PROOF OF MAILING; Filed by: Martin Matamoros (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) LIDYA KOLEVA; Filed by: Orbitz, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/17/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Untimely; Filed by: Martin Matamoros (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Martin Matamoros (Plaintiff); As to: Orbitz, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORBITZ is a litigant