Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 06:40:37 (UTC).

MARTHA MARISCAL-MOYA VS WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 MARTHA MARISCAL-MOYA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2460

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARISCAL-MOYA MARTHA

Defendant

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/28/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/28/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Re Venue

4/16/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Re Venue

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Hearing08/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Leave Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Martha Mariscal-Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Martha Mariscal-Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Re Venue; Filed by: Martha Mariscal-Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Martha Mariscal-Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Martha Mariscal-Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Martha Mariscal-Moya (Plaintiff); As to: Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA