This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 08:03:48 (UTC).

MARLIND FINANCE VS STEPHANIE HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 MARLIND FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHANIE HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0970

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARLIND FINANCE INC

Defendant

HERNANDEZ STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

8/23/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/23/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/08/2021

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/08/2021

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/8/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 10/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: MARLIND FINANCE, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARLIND FINANCE on 08/23/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Stephanie Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- MARLIND FINANCE, INC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from MARLIND FINANCE to MARLIND FINANCE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MARLIND FINANCE (Plaintiff); As to: Stephanie Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARLIND FINANCE INC is a litigant