This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 11:41:49 (UTC).

MARLENE ARANA, ET AL. VS DIEGA YAQUELIN MANCILLAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 MARLENE ARANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIEGA YAQUELIN MANCILLAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4108

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARANA DIAZ RICARDO

ARANA MARLENE

Defendants

1 TO 30 INCLUSIVE. DOES

RAMIREZ ORTEGA MARTIN

MANCILLAS DIEGA YAQUELIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE LA ROSA MARIO M

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

5/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/26/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marlene Arana (Plaintiff); Ricardo Arana Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: Diega Yaquelin Mancillas (Defendant); Martin Ramirez Ortega (Defendant); DOES 1 To 30, Inclusive. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marlene Arana (Plaintiff); Ricardo Arana Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: Diega Yaquelin Mancillas (Defendant); Martin Ramirez Ortega (Defendant); DOES 1 To 30, Inclusive. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marlene Arana (Plaintiff); Ricardo Arana Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: Diega Yaquelin Mancillas (Defendant); Martin Ramirez Ortega (Defendant); DOES 1 To 30, Inclusive. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE LA ROSA MARIO M