This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 12:03:48 (UTC).

MARIYA GOLUBCHYK VS APPLE, INC

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 MARIYA GOLUBCHYK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against APPLE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0196

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLUBCHYK MARIYA

Defendant

APPLE INC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/9/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • Hearing05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Mariya Golubchyk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mariya Golubchyk (Plaintiff); As to: Apple, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant