This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 10:24:08 (UTC).

MARIA NETSVETAEVA VS JOELLE WHITE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 MARIA NETSVETAEVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOELLE WHITE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6670

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NETSVETAEVA MARIA

Defendants

WHITE JOELLE

WHITE ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Netsvetaeva (Plaintiff); As to: Joelle White (Defendant); Andrew White (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Netsvetaeva (Plaintiff); As to: Joelle White (Defendant); Andrew White (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Netsvetaeva (Plaintiff); As to: Joelle White (Defendant); Andrew White (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR