This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 02:55:04 (UTC).

MARIA I POLANCO, ET AL. VS 5 STAR AUTO GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 MARIA I POLANCO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 5 STAR AUTO GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0062

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLANCO MARIA I

POSADAS ERICK E

Defendants

REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

SURETY

5 STAR AUTO GROUP DBA BILLION AUTO GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SHOECRAFT DEVIN T.

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

Other Attorneys

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

7/15/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/21/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

3/15/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/5/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: 5 Star Auto Group (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/2021; Service Cost: 146.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 06/15/2021; Service Cost: 67.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maria I Polanco, et al. on 01/05/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Maria I Polanco and Erick E Posadas as to Surety

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Regional Acceptance Corporation (Defendant); As to: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: 5 Star Auto Group (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/2021; Service Cost: 146.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: 5 Star Auto Group (Defendant); Regional Acceptance Corporation (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: 5 Star Auto Group (Defendant); Regional Acceptance Corporation (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria I Polanco (Plaintiff); Erick E Posadas (Plaintiff); As to: 5 Star Auto Group (Defendant); Regional Acceptance Corporation (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5 STAR AUTO GROUP DBA BILLION AUTO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where REGIONAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant