Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2021 at 08:21:26 (UTC).

MARIA GOMEZ VS ARTAK HAMBARDZUMYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 MARIA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTAK HAMBARDZUMYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2867

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ MARIA

Defendants

HAMBARDZUMYAN ANNA

HAMBARDZUMYAN ARTAK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMENEZ DANIEL F

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/21/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

4/12/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/12/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/12/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maria Gomez on 04/12/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maria Gomez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAddress for DANIEL F JIMENEZ (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Maria Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Hambardzumyan (Defendant); Service Date: 05/01/2021; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Maria Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Hambardzumyan (Defendant); Service Date: 05/01/2021; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Hambardzumyan (Defendant); Anna Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Hambardzumyan (Defendant); Anna Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Artak Hambardzumyan (Defendant); Anna Hambardzumyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIMENEZ DANIEL F.