This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 08:48:37 (UTC).

MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA VS MADILYNE R. DUFFY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MADILYNE R DUFFY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8269

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRISENO CUENCA MARIA DEL SOCORRO

Defendant

DUFFY MADILYNE R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/18/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

11/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/18/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/18/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/29/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA on 11/18/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA (Plaintiff); As to: MADILYNE r. DUFFY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAddress for IVAN M LOPEZ VENTURA (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA (Plaintiff); As to: MADILYNE r. DUFFY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA (Plaintiff); As to: MADILYNE r. DUFFY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA DEL SOCORRO BRISENO CUENCA (Plaintiff); As to: MADILYNE r. DUFFY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M.