Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 16:28:45 (UTC).

MARCUS M HUNTLEY VS JOEL MENA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 MARCUS M HUNTLEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOEL MENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0064

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNTLEY MARCUS M

Defendant

MENA JOEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/3/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • Hearing05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of remote appearance and exchange and submission of evidence protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Marcus M Huntley (Plaintiff); Joel Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Marcus M Huntley (Plaintiff); Joel Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Online dispute resolution ( ODR) meet and confer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Marcus M Huntley (Plaintiff); As to: Joel Mena (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/03/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marcus M Huntley (Plaintiff); As to: Joel Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less