This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 08:00:36 (UTC).

MARCEL BRAUSSARD VS BRIDGE MANAGMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 MARCEL BRAUSSARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRIDGE MANAGMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1024

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAUSSARD MARCEL

Defendant

BRIDGE MANAGMENT INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/23/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/23/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/23/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/23/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/17/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

2/14/2023: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/14/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2023

2/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Marcel Braussard on 12/23/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Marcel Braussard (Plaintiff); As to: Bridge Managment, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marcel Braussard (Plaintiff); As to: Bridge Managment, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Marcel Braussard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Marcelo D'Asero in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less