This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2022 at 05:46:29 (UTC).

MANNY TAVE VS FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 MANNY TAVE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0598

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAVE MANNY

Defendant

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/26/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/26/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/26/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

7/26/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/17/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing - Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

8/17/2022: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing - Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Manny Tave (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Manny Tave on 07/26/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Manny Tave as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Manny Tave (Plaintiff); As to: Federal Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Manny Tave (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Manny Tave (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 07/26/2022 to 07/26/2022; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant