Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 19:50:53 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MICHELLE O NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHELLE O NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5575

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NELSON AN INDIVIDUAL MICHELLE O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRISTOPHER D.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

4/2/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

4/5/2021: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

4/27/2021: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

4/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

4/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

4/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

2/18/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

2/18/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1788; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Copies; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 02/18/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by LVNV Funding LLC, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE O NELSON, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE O NELSON, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE O NELSON, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE O NELSON, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE O NELSON, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mandarich, Christopher D