Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 20:19:42 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS HOLLY QUINONES, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOLLY QUINONES, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5542

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

QUINONES AN INDIVIDUAL HOLLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRISTOPHER D.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/11/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/14/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

4/27/2021: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

4/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

4/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

4/27/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/28/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

2/18/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

2/18/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant); Interest: 28.27; Service Date: 06/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 04/27/2021 to 04/28/2021; Result Date changed from 04/28/2021 to 04/28/2021; As To Parties changed from HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant) to HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC against Defendant HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual on the Complaint filed by LVNV Funding LLC on 02/18/2021 for damages of $2,948.04, attorney fees of $266.88, and costs of $277.50 for a total of $3,492.42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Copies; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLY QUINONES, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mandarich, Christopher D