Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2021 at 17:02:33 (UTC).

LUIS GUERRERO RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS DESIDERIO AGUILAR TOMAS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 LUIS GUERRERO RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DESIDERIO AGUILAR TOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4008

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ MARIO

RODRIGUEZ LUIS GUERRERO

Defendant

TOMAS DESIDERIO AGUILAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINDLER ALAN F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/28/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/24/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by LUIS GUERRERO RODRIGUEZ, et al. on 05/24/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MARIO RODRIGUEZ as to DESIDERIO AGUILAR TOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LUIS GUERRERO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); MARIO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: DESIDERIO AGUILAR TOMAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LUIS GUERRERO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); MARIO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: DESIDERIO AGUILAR TOMAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LUIS GUERRERO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); MARIO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: DESIDERIO AGUILAR TOMAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINDLER ALAN F. ESQ.