This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 12:24:47 (UTC).

LUIS E. ZAPATA VS T-MOBILE USA INC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 LUIS E ZAPATA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against T-MOBILE USA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY S. LESSER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0671

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY S. LESSER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAPATA LUIS E.

Defendant

T-MOBILE USA INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

6/22/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/22/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/22/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/8/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department S13 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Luis E. Zapata (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile USA Inc (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/30/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Luis E. Zapata (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile USA Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory S. Lesser in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant