This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2023 at 13:21:51 (UTC).

LUCINA CALDERA VS COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 LUCINA CALDERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1087

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDERA LUCINA

Defendants

COLLECTION CONSULTANTS OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN TODD M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

2/10/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/10/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/10/2023: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

2/10/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

2/10/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Filed Not Entered

3/23/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal Filed Not Entered

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/5/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Lucina Caldera on 02/10/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Lucina Caldera as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff); As to: Collection Consultants of California (Defendant); DOES 1-10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Filed Not Entered: Name Extension: Filed Not Entered ; As To Parties changed from Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff) to Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2951483 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2951484 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Lucina Caldera on 02/10/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Lucina Caldera

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff); As to: Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff); As to: Collection Consultants of California (Defendant); DOES 1-10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff); As to: Collection Consultants of California (Defendant); DOES 1-10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lucina Caldera (Plaintiff); As to: Collection Consultants of California (Defendant); DOES 1-10 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less