This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 00:01:08 (UTC).

LUCILLA MALIK VS MERAKI MANAGEMENT, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 LUCILLA MALIK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MERAKI MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE F. BIRD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0140

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE F. BIRD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALIK LUCILLA

Defendants

BLAUBUKS AGRIS

BARROSO CESAR

MERAKI MANAGEMENT INC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/12/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/27/2021

4/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/27/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2021

7/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lucilla Malik on 01/12/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 07/01/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/01/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Lucilla Malik (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Lucilla Malik (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lucilla Malik (Plaintiff); As to: Meraki Management, Inc (Defendant); Cesar Barroso (Defendant); Agris Blaubuks (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. George F. Bird in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD MODEL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant