This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 21:54:48 (UTC).

LOVE VINTAGE, INC., ET AL. VS NIKEA TRADE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 LOVE VINTAGE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NIKEA TRADE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4701

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LOVE VINTAGE INC.

KIM ANGIE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

NIKEA TRADE INC.

KWON YOONJOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARKIN STEVEN J

Defendant Attorneys

RYU FRANCIS S.

RYU FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

9/13/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/14/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6/24/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

6/24/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6/24/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2024
  • Hearing06/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: NIKEA TRADE, INC. (Defendant); YOONJOUNG KWON (Defendant); As to: LOVE VINTAGE, INC. (Plaintiff); ANGIE KIM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NIKEA TRADE, INC. (Defendant); YOONJOUNG KWON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOVE VINTAGE, INC. (Plaintiff); ANGIE KIM (Plaintiff); As to: NIKEA TRADE, INC. (Defendant); YOONJOUNG KWON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOVE VINTAGE, INC. (Plaintiff); ANGIE KIM (Plaintiff); As to: NIKEA TRADE, INC. (Defendant); YOONJOUNG KWON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LOVE VINTAGE, INC. (Plaintiff); ANGIE KIM (Plaintiff); As to: NIKEA TRADE, INC. (Defendant); YOONJOUNG KWON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOVE VINTAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYU FRANCIS