This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 12:15:33 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS HOLLY PADILLA

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOLLY PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8939

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendant

PADILLA HOLLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER DENNIS KENT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/17/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/17/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/17/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/13/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity on 12/17/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Holly Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Holly Padilla; On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity on 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Holly Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Holly Padilla (Defendant); Service Date: 12/28/2021; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Holly Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Holly Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Holly Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEELER DENNIS KENT