This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 04:03:18 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS GEOFFREY DENT

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed an Other lawsuit against GEOFFREY DENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6272

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendant

DENT GEOFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKLES SABRYNA D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/26/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/26/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/26/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2024
  • Hearing08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: Geoffrey Dent (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: Geoffrey Dent (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a Public Entity (Plaintiff); As to: Geoffrey Dent (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant