This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 18:13:48 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS AIDA ESPIRITU

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AIDA ESPIRITU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7855

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendant

ESPIRITU AIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER DENNIS KENT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/2/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/2/2021: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2024
  • Hearing11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Aida Espiritu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Aida Espiritu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Aida Espiritu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEELER DENNIS KENT