This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 14:20:57 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS SERGIO SAMAYOA

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERGIO SAMAYOA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1900

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SAMAYOA SERGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/31/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/31/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/31/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/27/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/27/2022: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: 07/15/2024; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: Sergio Samayoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Samayoa (Defendant); Service Date: 06/13/2022; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Samayoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Samayoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Sergio Samayoa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES