This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 16:43:30 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS MICHAEL CRAIG

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL CRAIG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6871

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

CRAIG MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLCLOUGH III ESQ. ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/19/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/19/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

10/18/2021: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Request (name extension) - Request t for Attorney Fees

10/18/2021: Request (name extension) - Request t for Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/18/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

10/18/2021: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/18/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Judgment

10/22/2021: Judgment - Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (ORANGE)

10/28/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (ORANGE)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/26/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (ORANGE); Issued by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant); County: ORANGE; Principal: 3618.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Status Date changed from 10/22/2021 to 10/22/2021; Filed By: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/22/2021; As To Parties changed from Michael Craig (Defendant) to Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Los Angeles Federal Credit Union against Defendant Michael Craig on the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on 07/19/2021 for the principal amount of $2,673.83, attorney fees of $283.90, interest of $368.65, and costs of $292.00 for a total of $3,618.38.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on 07/19/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Michael Craig; On the Complaint filed by Los Angeles Federal Credit Union on 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant); Service Date: 08/01/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Craig (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. COLCLOUGH III