This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2022 at 12:27:23 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS JULIO ARROYO

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JULIO ARROYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3426

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

ARROYO JULIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANAYA ALANA B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/19/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/19/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/19/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Complaint - Complaint

5/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/18/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/12/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/12/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/12/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

7/12/2022: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/12/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2025
  • Hearing05/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JULIO ARROYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to JULIO ARROYO; On the Complaint filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JULIO ARROYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket; Default not entered as to JULIO ARROYO; On the Complaint filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from JULIO ARROYO (Defendant) to JULIO ARROYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JULIO ARROYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JULIO ARROYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: JULIO ARROYO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant