Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 14:43:01 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5065

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

GUTIERREZ FERNANDO LLAMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANAYA ALANA B

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/13/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/13/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

4/13/2021: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/21/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/10/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 04/13/2021 to 04/13/2021; Filed By: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/19/2021; As To Parties changed from FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant) to FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION against Defendant FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ on the Complaint filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 02/10/2021 for the principal amount of $23,352.78, attorney fees of $1,090.58, and costs of $439.00 for a total of $24,882.36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 02/10/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, does 1-40 inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ; On the Complaint filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 02/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2021; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: FERNANDO LLAMAS GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant