Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 11:01:27 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY VS JASON D HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 LOS ANGELES COUNTY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JASON D HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0406

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Defendant

HERNANDEZ JASON D

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/30/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/30/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • Hearing05/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department F44 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Plaintiff); As to: Jason D Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer- Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Jason D Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Jason D Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 05/20/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant