This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2023 at 06:26:10 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER VS HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HP COMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0947

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

Defendant

HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

2/24/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

2/24/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/24/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/3/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/06/2023

3/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/06/2023

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

4/20/2023: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/1/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/01/2023

6/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/01/2023

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/1/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/16/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power on 02/24/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08/03/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power (Plaintiff); As to: HP Communications Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/25/2023; Service Cost: 185.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/06/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A - Hon. Thomas J. Griego; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Emma Castro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from HP Communications Inc. (Defendant) to HP Communications Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Los Angeles County Department of Water and Power (Plaintiff); As to: HP Communications Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less