This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 06:20:54 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS VS BRADLEY PHILLIP DODDS

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRADLEY PHILLIP DODDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1333

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

Defendant

DODDS BRADLEY PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/13/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

7/13/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/13/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/20/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings - Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings - Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order for Transfer, Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2021, Minute Order (Court Order)]

8/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order for Transfer, Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2021, Minute Order (Court Order)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Application and Order for Transfer - Application and Order for Transfer

7/27/2021: Application and Order for Transfer - Application and Order for Transfer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference) of 12/16/2022

12/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference) of 12/16/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2024
  • Hearing01/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketHearing - Other Re Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/23/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Re Final Status Conference) of 12/16/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketHearing - Other Re Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Application and Order for Transfer, Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2021, Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Transfer; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 29 - Hon. Serena R. Murillo; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS (Plaintiff); As to: BRADLEY PHILLIP DODDS (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS (Plaintiff); As to: BRADLEY PHILLIP DODDS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less