This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 06:39:46 (UTC).

LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6250

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC. DBA LONGWOOD MANOR CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DHARWADKAR SHILPA R.

Defendant Attorney

GRASTY WILLIAM MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/26/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/26/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/26/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/26/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

General Denial - General Denial

12/2/2021: General Denial - General Denial

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2024
  • Hearing08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant); As to: Longwood Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Longwood Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Longwood Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Longwood Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Longwood Enterprises, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant