This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 10:17:54 (UTC).

LONESTAR WEST SERVICES, LLC VS PLUMBER HERO, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 LONESTAR WEST SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PLUMBER HERO, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2550

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONESTAR WEST SERVICES LLC

Defendant

PLUMBER HERO INC. A CORPORATION DBA ROOTER HERO PLUMBING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/1/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lonestar West Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Plumber Hero, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/10/2023; Service Cost: 101.22; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lonestar West Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Plumber Hero, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lonestar West Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Plumber Hero, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lonestar West Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Plumber Hero, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less