This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 13:01:48 (UTC).

LISA DAVIDSON VS RITE AID CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 LISA DAVIDSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RITE AID CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2170

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIDSON LISA

Defendant

RITE AID CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDSON PERRIN

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/15/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/29/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Lisa Davidson on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/19/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lisa Davidson (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON PERRIN