Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2021 at 16:15:27 (UTC).

LINDA MONTEMAYOR VS CITY OF CULVER CITY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 LINDA MONTEMAYOR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF CULVER CITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1434

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTEMAYOR LINDA

Defendant

CITY OF CULVER CITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GALLEGOS GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/18/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2024
  • Hearing02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Linda Montemayor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Culver City (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Linda Montemayor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Culver City (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Linda Montemayor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Culver City (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less