Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 11:43:05 (UTC).

LINDA JOHNSON VS MARIE LUNA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 LINDA JOHNSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIE LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0073

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON LINDA

Defendants

LUNA MARIE

LUNA HARO GUADALUPE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/27/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/21/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Hearing05/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Linda Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Haro Guadalupe Luna (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/27/21; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Linda Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Marie Luna (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Linda Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Marie Luna (Defendant); Haro Guadalupe Luna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Linda Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Linda Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less