This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 04:03:23 (UTC).

LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP VS JACQUELINE SADHAR

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACQUELINE SADHAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8140

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP

Defendant

SADHAR JACQUELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIFE LUX

LESLIE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Order Determining Claim of Exemption - Order Determining Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy)

4/26/2022: Order Determining Claim of Exemption - Order Determining Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy)

Claim of Exemption - Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy)

4/26/2022: Claim of Exemption - Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...) of 04/26/2022

4/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...) of 04/26/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...)

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim - Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

4/1/2022: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim - Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

4/1/2022: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3/11/2022: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/11/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles )

3/14/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles )

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Spousal Affidavit

2/7/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Spousal Affidavit

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

2/8/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

12/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/21/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

12/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketClaim of Exemption; Filed by: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement; Filed by: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...) of 04/26/2022: Status Date changed from 04/26/2022 to 04/26/2022; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy): Filed By: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant); Result: Denied; Name Extension: (Bank Levy); Result Date: 04/26/2022; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketOrder Determining Claim of Exemption (Bank Levy); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim of Kameron Se...) of 04/26/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Sadhar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIFE LUX