This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 23:29:44 (UTC).

LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP VS ANAY GALVEZ MONDRAGON

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANAY GALVEZ MONDRAGON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5790

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP

Defendant

GALVEZ MONDRAGON ANAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESLIE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/10/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/10/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/6/2022: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/5/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/5/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/5/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Life Family Law Group against Defendant Anay Galvez Mondragon on the Complaint filed by Life Family Law Group on 03/10/2022 for the principal amount of $24,999.00, interest of $1,568.43, and costs of $542.25 for a total of $27,109.68.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant); Service Date: 03/29/2022; Service Cost: 170.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Anay Galvez Mondragon; On the Complaint filed by Life Family Law Group on 03/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant); Service Date: 03/29/2022; Service Cost: 170.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Life Family Law Group (Plaintiff); As to: Anay Galvez Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFE FAMILY LAW GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.