Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 00:48:41 (UTC).

LEON OWEN JONES VS OFFICE DEPOT, INC. A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 LEON OWEN JONES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OFFICE DEPOT, INC A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH M. FULLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0459

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH M. FULLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES LEON OWEN

Defendant

OFFICE DEPOT INC. A CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/4/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2021

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2021

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/15/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/12/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/12/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

4/12/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 06/04/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Leon Owen Jones on 04/12/2021 as follows: Defendant Office Depot, Inc. A Corporation does not owe the plaintiff Leon Owen Jones any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Leon Owen Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Office Depot, Inc. A Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Leon Owen Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Office Depot, Inc. A Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenneth M. Fuller in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Office Depot, Inc. A Corporation (Defendant) to Office Depot, Inc. A Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/04/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE DEPOT/OFFICE MAX is a litigant