This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 16:29:01 (UTC).

LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN VS NADER ESKANDARI

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 LAW OFFICES OF SARA A WEINSTEIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NADER ESKANDARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5500

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN

Defendant

ESKANDARI NADER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN IRA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/28/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/28/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/28/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/28/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment

1/3/2022: Judgment - Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sara A. Weinstein

12/16/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sara A. Weinstein

Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

12/16/2021: Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/12/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN against Defendant NADER ESKANDARI on the Complaint filed by LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN on 07/28/2021 for damages of $13,964.47, attorney fees of $500.00, interest of $2,949.04, and costs of $460.20 for a total of $17,873.71.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff); As to: NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant) to NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff); As to: NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Sara A. Weinstein; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to NADER ESKANDARI; On the Complaint filed by LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN on 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff); As to: NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff); As to: NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LAW OFFICES OF SARA A. WEINSTEIN (Plaintiff); As to: NADER ESKANDARI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN IRA M.