Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 18:41:35 (UTC).

LAURIE SHARP VS KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 LAURIE SHARP filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1521

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARP LAURIE

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YOUNGKYOO RO ERIC

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ST. ROMAIN SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/22/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/22/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LAURIE SHARP (Plaintiff); As to: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a California corporation (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LAURIE SHARP (Plaintiff); As to: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a California corporation (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LAURIE SHARP (Plaintiff); As to: KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, a California corporation (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a California corporation (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ST. ROMAIN SAMUEL