This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 04:34:54 (UTC).

LAUREN MICHELLE CHASE VS BRIAN KENNEDY SEALS

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 LAUREN MICHELLE CHASE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIAN KENNEDY SEALS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6326

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHASE LAUREN MICHELLE

Defendant

SEALS BRIAN KENNEDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

8/30/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

8/30/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/30/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/30/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

8/30/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2024
  • Hearing09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant) to Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Brian Kennedy Seals; On the Complaint filed by Lauren Michelle Chase on 08/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/13/2021; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Kennedy Seals (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lauren Michelle Chase (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH