This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 15:38:44 (UTC).

LANCE LIBIANO, ET AL. VS DADSON WASHER SERVICE, INC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 LANCE LIBIANO, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DADSON WASHER SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY S. LESSER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0657

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY S. LESSER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIBIANO LANCE

STARBIANO LLC

Defendant

DADSON WASHER SERVICE INC

 

Court Documents

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

12/14/2022: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Request to Pay Judgment to Court

12/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 09/29/2022

9/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 09/29/2022

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

9/29/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

8/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

8/29/2022: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/29/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment - Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

8/11/2022: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment - Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order- pursuant to the Plaintiff's Request to C...) of 08/11/2022

8/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order- pursuant to the Plaintiff's Request to C...) of 08/11/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order- pursuant to the Plaintiff's Request to C...)

8/11/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order- pursuant to the Plaintiff's Request to C...)

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

8/2/2022: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/29/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

8/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/29/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/29/2022

7/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/29/2022

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Lance Libiano (Plaintiff); Starbiano, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Filed By: Dadson Washer Service, Inc (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Starbiano, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Dadson Washer Service, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 09/29/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 09/29/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Dadson Washer Service, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 07/29/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Starbiano, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Lance Libiano and Plaintiff Starbiano, LLC against Defendant Dadson Washer Service, Inc on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lance Libiano, et al. on 06/17/2022 for costs of $216.85 for a total of $216.85.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lance Libiano (Plaintiff); Starbiano, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Dadson Washer Service, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/30/2022; Service Cost: 166.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lance Libiano (Plaintiff); Starbiano, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Dadson Washer Service, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory S. Lesser in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARBIANO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DADSON WASHER SERVICE INC is a litigant