This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 12:53:31 (UTC).

LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC VS SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SKY ISLAND, INC , A SUSPENDED CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3946

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR LLC

Defendants

SKY ISLAND INC. A SUSPENDED CORPORATION

PINEAPPLE EXPRESS A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDMAN MARTIN F

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/9/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/23/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/23/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

6/23/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION; SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION; On the Complaint filed by LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC on 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC against Defendant SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION and Defendant PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION on the Complaint filed by LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC on 04/09/2021 for the principal amount of $14,200.00, attorney fees of $1,000.00, interest of $2,548.22, and costs of $497.44 for a total of $18,245.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC on 04/09/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, does 1 through 20 inclusive only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/23/2021; Service Cost: 54.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/23/2021; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION; SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION; On the Complaint filed by LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC on 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: SKY ISLAND, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION (Defendant); PINEAPPLE EXPRESS, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKY ISLAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PINEAPPLE EXPRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDMAN MARTIN F