This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2022 at 23:10:06 (UTC).

KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY VS SBB ROOFING, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SBB ROOFING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1809

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SBB ROOFING INC. DBA BILT WELL ROOFING & SOLAR

KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

6/7/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Petition

6/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/7/2021: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

6/7/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award,...)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award,...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Judgment - Judgment [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

10/13/2021: Judgment - Judgment [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

10/25/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Submittal of Proposed Form of Judgment Pursuant to Granting of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (10/12/2021) scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Status Date changed from 10/13/2021 to 10/13/2021; Name Extension: blank; Result Date changed from 10/13/2021 to 10/13/2021; As To Parties changed from SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent) to SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner Kinsale Insurance Company against Respondent SBB ROOFING, INC. DBA Bilt Well Roofing & Solar on the Petition filed by Kinsale Insurance Company on 06/07/2021 for the principal amount of $7,175.00 and interest of $2,492.58 for a total of $9,667.58.; Other: Interest calculated at the rate of ten percent (10%) per annum from April 23, 2018 to date of entry of judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT: Filed By: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Submittal of Proposed Form of Judgment Pursuant to Granting of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (10/12/2021) scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award,...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award, Filed by Petitioner Kinsale Insurance Company scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/12/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award: Filed By: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAddress for Peter Ko Chu, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/11/2021; Service Cost: 139.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Kinsale Insurance Company (Petitioner); As to: SBB ROOFING, INC. (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant