This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 14:53:11 (UTC).

KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS KA'LONI L FORD

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KA'LONI L FORD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1934

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

FORD KA'LONI L

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

6/1/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/1/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/1/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/19/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 07/19/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Kinecta Federal Credit Union against Defendant Ka'loni L Ford on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kinecta Federal Credit Union on 06/01/2021 for the principal amount of $1,194.84 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $1,264.84.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Ka'loni L Ford (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/22/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Ka'loni L Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant