This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2021 at 19:32:18 (UTC).

KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS DAVID SONG

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVID SONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2218

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SONG DAVID

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/22/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

6/22/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

6/22/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/19/2021

8/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/19/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Ugunda Toussant

8/19/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Ugunda Toussant

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/19/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 08/19/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Ugunda Toussant; Filed by: Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Kinecta Federal Credit Union against Defendant David Song on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kinecta Federal Credit Union on 06/22/2021 for the principal amount of $1,952.52 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,042.52.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: David Song (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/19/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: David Song (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINECTA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant