This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 00:35:20 (UTC).

KIMBERLY COLAUTTI VS SAMUEL COOLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 KIMBERLY COLAUTTI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAMUEL COOLEY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9092

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLAUTTI KIMBERLY

Defendants

COOLEY SAMUEL

COOLEY THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMRAN M.H. TONY

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/7/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/7/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/28/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/5/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/5/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/5/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/6/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/27/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/4/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/5/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

12/28/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

12/28/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/28/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

12/28/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

12/28/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2024
  • Hearing12/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Samuel Cooley; On the Complaint filed by Kimberly Colautti on 12/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from Samuel Cooley (Defendant) to Samuel Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant); Thomas Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant); Thomas Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant); Thomas Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kimberly Colautti (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Cooley (Defendant); Thomas Cooley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAMRAN M.H. TONY ESQ.