This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 18:53:16 (UTC).

KEVIN DEWALT VS DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 KEVIN DEWALT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0055

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEWALT KEVIN

Defendant

DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/14/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/14/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/14/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Damco Distribution Svcs, Inc

1/26/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Damco Distribution Svcs, Inc

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/1/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Statement of Decision

3/1/2022: Other - (name extension) - Other - Statement of Decision

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/01/2022

3/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/01/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

3/1/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

3/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

3/14/2022: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer - Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]

3/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment - Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

3/25/2022: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment - Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: KEVIN DEWALT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketRequest to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Filed by: KEVIN DEWALT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by KEVIN DEWALT on 01/14/2022 as follows: Defendant DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC does not owe the plaintiff KEVIN DEWALT any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: STATEMENT OF DECISION IS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOther - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/01/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2022; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Damco Distribution Svcs, Inc; Filed by: KEVIN DEWALT (Plaintiff); As to: DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: KEVIN DEWALT (Plaintiff); As to: DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC (Defendant) to DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC (Defendant) to DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SVCS, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC. DBA HUDD TRANSPORTATION is a litigant