This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 11:24:53 (UTC).

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #H VS ERIKA GENCHI

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, H filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERIKA GENCHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #H

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #II

Defendant

GENCHI ERIKA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/14/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/24/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/24/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II against Defendant ERIKA GENCHI on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #H on 01/14/2021 for the principal amount of $2,361.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,451.00.; Other: The Plaintiff may proceed with the Lien Sale.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II (Plaintiff); As to: ERIKA GENCHI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/26/21; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #H to KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #H (Plaintiff); As to: ERIKA GENCHI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #H is a litigant