This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 05:50:12 (UTC).

KENNETH TURNER VS FOOD 4 LESS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 KENNETH TURNER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0310

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TURNER KENNETH

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.

FOOD 4 LESS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/8/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/8/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

7/9/2021: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/3/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

5/18/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/18/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/2/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/2/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

5/18/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

4/29/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

4/29/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/29/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Receipt for Exhibits: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Receipt for Exhibits: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Receipt for Exhibits: Status Date changed from 07/08/2021 to 08/16/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant Food 4 Less Southern California Inc. and Defendant American Guard Services, Inc. against Plaintiff Kenneth Turner on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (2nd) filed by Kenneth Turner on 04/29/2021 for a total of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/03/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: Kenneth Turner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Receipt for Exhibits: Status Date changed from 08/16/2021 to 07/09/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Compton Courthouse in Department 105 - Hon. LaTonya Hadnot Prioleau; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenneth Turner (Plaintiff); As to: Food 4 Less Southern California (Defendant); American Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenneth Turner (Plaintiff); As to: Food 4 Less Southern California Inc. (Defendant); American Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kenneth Turner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Kenneth Turner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenneth Turner (Plaintiff); As to: Food 4 Less Southern California (Defendant); American Guard Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant