This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 00:37:47 (UTC).

KBR INC. VS ALI TAVAKOLI

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 KBR INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALI TAVAKOLI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9997

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KBR INC. DBA RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES

Defendant

TAVAKOLI ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLIVEIRA DUANE STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/19/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case, Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740), Summons on

5/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case, Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740), Summons on

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case, Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740), Summons on Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case, Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740), Summons on Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet]: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KBR Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Ali Tavakoli (Defendant) to Ali Tavakoli (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Ali Tavakoli (Defendant) to Ali Tavakoli (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Ali Tavakoli (Defendant) to Ali Tavakoli (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KBR Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ali Tavakoli (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KBR Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ali Tavakoli (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KBR Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliveira, Duane S